Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Civil case represented by Solomon, Julie B., against Simonelli, Anthony, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 18, 2012 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 03, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 04, 2017 | Docket Event | of Appearance | |
August 03, 2016 | Docket Event | Returned | |
September 17, 2015 | Hearing |
Citation in Supplemental Proceedings At the request of Plaintiff's Attorney Judge: Clifton, William C. |
|
August 04, 2015 | Docket Event | of Appearance | |
July 31, 2015 | Docket Event | Citation Issued as Ordered | |
July 29, 2015 | Docket Event | Requested | |
April 21, 2015 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment Hearing Concluded Judge: Gorman (Retired), Walter |
|
April 21, 2015 | Docket Event | Disposed | |
April 21, 2015 | Docket Event | Entered | |
March 12, 2015 | Docket Event | for Summary Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.