Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Civil case represented by Johnson, Robert E. Jr., against Zoglio, Steven, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 18, 2012 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 06, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Disposed | |
July 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Dismissed | |
October 23, 2015 | Docket Event | of Appearance | |
June 25, 2015 | Docket Event | Returned Served | |
December 20, 2012 | Docket Event | Applied | |
December 18, 2012 | Docket Event | Book Account Filed | |
December 18, 2012 | Docket Event | Case Filed | |
December 18, 2012 | Docket Event | Case Data Entry |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.