Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Civil case represented by Hall, Joseph M, against Urizar, Angela, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 18, 2012 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 07, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 24, 2014 | Hearing |
Citation in Supplemental Proceedings Occurred |
|
June 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Filed Agreement For Payment | |
April 08, 2014 | Docket Event | Returned | |
December 23, 2013 | Docket Event | Applied | |
December 23, 2013 | Docket Event | Citation Issued as Ordered | |
December 23, 2013 | Docket Event | Fee | |
September 12, 2013 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages Occurred |
|
September 12, 2013 | Docket Event | Under Rule of Court | |
August 26, 2013 | Docket Event | Returned | |
May 17, 2013 | Docket Event | Issued as Ordered |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.