Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Hall, Joseph M, against Harris, Susan, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 18, 2012 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 03, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 30, 2017 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages Granted Under Rule of Court |
|
September 29, 2017 | Docket Event | to Attach Wages | |
October 27, 2015 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages Granted Under Rule of Court |
|
October 06, 2015 | Docket Event | to Attach Wages | |
March 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Filed Agreement For Payment | |
March 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Conversion | |
February 14, 2013 | Docket Event | Returned Served | |
December 20, 2012 | Docket Event | Applied | |
December 18, 2012 | Docket Event | Book Account Filed | |
December 18, 2012 | Docket Event | Case Data Entry |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.