Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Hall, Joseph M, against Hoard, Joan, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 18, 2012 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 07, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 27, 2014 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages Occurred |
|
May 27, 2014 | Docket Event | Under Rule of Court | |
November 12, 2013 | Docket Event | Returned | |
June 18, 2013 | Docket Event | Issued as Ordered | |
June 17, 2013 | Docket Event | Applied | |
June 14, 2013 | Docket Event | Fee | |
June 03, 2013 | Docket Event | Filed | |
April 08, 2013 | Docket Event | of Non-Military Service | |
April 08, 2013 | Docket Event | Conversion | |
April 08, 2013 | Docket Event | And Default Entered |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.