Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Hall, Joseph M, against Delbonis, Robert, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 18, 2012 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 07, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 09, 2014 | Docket Event | Attachment Returned | |
May 28, 2014 | Docket Event | Attachment Issued As Ordered | |
May 27, 2014 | Hearing |
Citation in Supplemental Proceedings Occurred |
|
May 27, 2014 | Docket Event | Attachment Requested | |
May 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Returned | |
November 01, 2013 | Docket Event | Applied | |
October 31, 2013 | Docket Event | Citation Issued as Ordered | |
October 31, 2013 | Docket Event | Fee | |
May 06, 2013 | Docket Event | Filed Agreement For Payment | |
May 06, 2013 | Docket Event | Conversion |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.