Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Laing, Lynda L., against Gorrie, John, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 17, 2012 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 03, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 2013 | Docket Event | Returned | |
February 28, 2013 | Docket Event | Citation Issued as Ordered | |
February 21, 2013 | Docket Event | Applied | |
February 19, 2013 | Docket Event | Fee | |
February 05, 2013 | Docket Event | of Non-Military Service | |
February 05, 2013 | Docket Event | Conversion | |
February 05, 2013 | Docket Event | And Default Entered | |
December 20, 2012 | Docket Event | Applied | |
December 17, 2012 | Docket Event | Returned Served | |
December 17, 2012 | Docket Event | Book Account Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.