Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Material Concrete Corporation, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Laing, Lynda L., against George H. Dean Inc., in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 17, 2012 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 03, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 17, 2013 | Hearing |
Citation in Supplemental Proceedings Passed |
|
September 16, 2013 | Docket Event | Passed | |
August 27, 2013 | Hearing |
Citation in Supplemental Proceedings Continued for Further Hearing |
|
August 26, 2013 | Docket Event | Conversion | |
August 05, 2013 | Docket Event | Duces Tecum | |
August 05, 2013 | Docket Event | Returned | |
May 10, 2013 | Docket Event | Citation Issued as Ordered | |
May 02, 2013 | Docket Event | Applied | |
April 24, 2013 | Docket Event | Fee | |
April 15, 2013 | Docket Event | And Default Entered |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.