Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Laing, Lynda L., against Harris, Henry, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 17, 2012 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 03, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 08, 2014 | Hearing |
Citation in Supplemental Proceedings Passed |
|
April 08, 2014 | Docket Event | Passed | |
January 21, 2014 | Hearing |
Citation in Supplemental Proceedings Continued for Further Hearing |
|
January 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Conversion | |
January 16, 2014 | Docket Event | Returned | |
December 05, 2013 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages Occurred |
|
December 05, 2013 | Docket Event | Under Rule of Court | |
October 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Applied | |
October 29, 2013 | Docket Event | Citation Issued as Ordered | |
October 29, 2013 | Docket Event | Fee |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.