Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
New England Institute Of Technology, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Laing, Lynda L., against Montalban, Roberto, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 17, 2012 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 25, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Case Outcome TypeNon-Trial Disposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 28, 2022 | Hearing | Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages | |
August 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Document Filed | |
August 31, 2022 | Docket Event | to Attach Wages | |
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Entered | |
March 04, 2022 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages Granted Under Rule of Court |
|
March 04, 2022 | Hearing | Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages | |
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event | to Attach Wages | |
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Entered | |
July 19, 2021 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages Granted Under Rule of Court |
|
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Granted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.