Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Lyon, Neill B., against Horan, Laurel, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 17, 2012 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 03, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Dismissed without Prejudice | |
October 31, 2018 | Docket Event | of Attachment Released | |
August 16, 2017 | Docket Event | Mail Returned Served | |
June 25, 2017 | Docket Event | For Writ of Attachment | |
June 22, 2017 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages Granted Under Rule of Court |
|
May 12, 2017 | Docket Event | to Attach Wages | |
April 20, 2017 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages Granted Under Rule of Court |
|
March 01, 2017 | Docket Event | to Attach Wages | |
February 17, 2015 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages Granted Under Rule of Court |
|
January 20, 2015 | Docket Event | to Attach Wages |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.