Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Taft & Mcsally Llp, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Wallick, Marc D, against King, Mary Ellen, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 17, 2012 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 06, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 11, 2014 | Docket Event | Stipulation File for Dismissal | |
April 11, 2014 | Docket Event | of Attachment Filed | |
February 07, 2014 | Docket Event | Entered | |
February 06, 2014 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Charge Garnishee Occurred |
|
February 06, 2014 | Docket Event | Under Rule of Court | |
January 28, 2014 | Hearing |
Hearing on Notice of Attachment Occurred |
|
January 27, 2014 | Docket Event | Under Rule of Court | |
January 22, 2014 | Docket Event | Filed | |
September 10, 2013 | Hearing |
Citation in Supplemental Proceedings Occurred |
|
September 10, 2013 | Docket Event | Fails To Appear |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.