Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Michael Perri & Sons Inc, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Wallick, Marc D, against Northeast Excavating Llc, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 17, 2012 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 03, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 19, 2013 | Docket Event | Issued as Ordered | |
February 18, 2013 | Docket Event | Fee | |
February 18, 2013 | Docket Event | Applied | |
February 07, 2013 | Docket Event | Conversion | |
January 30, 2013 | Docket Event | of Non-Military Service | |
January 30, 2013 | Docket Event | And Default Entered | |
December 20, 2012 | Docket Event | Applied | |
December 17, 2012 | Docket Event | Book Account Filed | |
December 17, 2012 | Docket Event | Returned Served | |
December 17, 2012 | Docket Event | Case Data Entry |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.