Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
West Bay Recovery, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Giovannini, Andrew M., Gaskell, John T., against Muscente, Donald Sr., represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 17, 2012 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 06, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit Filed | |
November 07, 2019 | Hearing |
Hearing on Notice of Attachment Granted Under Rule of Court |
|
November 01, 2019 | Docket Event | of Attachment Filed | |
October 10, 2019 | Docket Event | For Writ of Attachment | |
October 26, 2017 | Hearing |
Hearing on Notice of Attachment Granted Under Rule of Court |
|
October 23, 2017 | Docket Event | Affidavit Filed | |
October 16, 2017 | Docket Event | of Attachment Filed | |
September 21, 2017 | Docket Event | of Attachment Filed | |
September 07, 2017 | Docket Event | of Attachment Filed | |
September 07, 2017 | Docket Event | For Writ of Attachment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.