Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Asset Acceptance Llc Assignee Of Providian Bank, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Applebaum, Richard B., against Swenson, Deborah, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 04, 2012 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 03, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Case Outcome TypeNon-Trial Disposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Dismissed Against Defendant | |
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Entered | |
May 19, 2021 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages Granted Under Rule of Court |
|
May 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Granted | |
April 22, 2021 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages At the request of Plaintiff's Attorney |
|
April 16, 2021 | Docket Event | to Attach Wages | |
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event | to Attach Wages | |
August 06, 2013 | Docket Event | of Attachment Filed | |
July 26, 2013 | Docket Event | Entered | |
July 23, 2013 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages Occurred |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.