Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Asset Acceptance Llc Assignee Of Providian Bank, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Applebaum, Richard B., against Patnaude, David, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 04, 2012 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 03, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Dismissed Against Defendant | |
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Entered | |
January 21, 2021 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages Granted Under Rule of Court |
|
January 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Granted | |
December 30, 2020 | Docket Event | to Attach Wages | |
May 28, 2013 | Hearing |
Citation in Supplemental Proceedings Passed |
|
May 28, 2013 | Docket Event | Passed | |
April 26, 2013 | Docket Event | Returned | |
February 18, 2013 | Docket Event | Citation Issued as Ordered | |
February 11, 2013 | Docket Event | Applied |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.