Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Td Bank, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Johnson, Robert E. Jr., Hall, Joseph M, against Troxell, Erin, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 04, 2012 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 03, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 17, 2015 | Docket Event | of Appearance | |
December 16, 2015 | Docket Event | Returned | |
November 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Applied | |
November 21, 2013 | Docket Event | Citation Issued as Ordered | |
November 12, 2013 | Docket Event | Fee | |
July 18, 2013 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Substitute a Party Occurred |
|
July 18, 2013 | Docket Event | Granted | |
February 19, 2013 | Docket Event | Filed Agreement For Payment | |
January 16, 2013 | Docket Event | Returned Served | |
December 10, 2012 | Docket Event | Applied |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.