Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Civil case represented by Solomon, Julie B., Johnson, Robert E. Jr., Hall, Joseph M, against Delia, Cosimo, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 04, 2012 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 06, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 20, 2017 | Docket Event | of Appearance | |
November 03, 2016 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages Granted Under Rule of Court |
|
October 14, 2016 | Docket Event | of Appearance | |
October 13, 2016 | Docket Event | to Attach Wages | |
April 02, 2013 | Docket Event | Conversion | |
April 02, 2013 | Docket Event | And Default Entered | |
April 02, 2013 | Docket Event | of Non-Military Service | |
January 10, 2013 | Docket Event | Returned Served | |
December 10, 2012 | Docket Event | Applied | |
December 04, 2012 | Docket Event | Book Account Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.