Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Dumont, Jeanine M, Hall, Joseph M, against Verrier, William, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts with Brian A. Goldman presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 04, 2012 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 03, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Case Outcome TypeNon-Trial Disposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 16, 2019 | Docket Event | of Appearance | |
March 29, 2018 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages Granted Under Rule of Court |
|
February 09, 2018 | Docket Event | to Attach Wages | |
December 12, 2017 | Hearing |
Citation in Supplemental Proceedings At the request of Plaintiff's Attorney Judge: Goldman, Brian A. |
|
September 15, 2017 | Docket Event | Citation Issued as Ordered | |
August 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Transferred to Records Center | |
July 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Requested | |
July 06, 2017 | Docket Event | of Appearance | |
April 08, 2013 | Docket Event | Conversion | |
April 08, 2013 | Docket Event | And Default Entered |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.