Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Ncep Llc, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Phipps, Jennifer Marie, Hammer, Scott L., against Finnegan, Bonnie, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 04, 2012 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedJune 17, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 20, 2022 | Hearing | Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages | |
May 20, 2022 | Docket Event | to Attach Wages | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Entered | |
August 30, 2021 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages Granted Under Rule of Court |
|
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Granted | |
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event | to Attach Wages | |
November 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Document Filed | |
July 15, 2020 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages Granted Under Rule of Court |
|
June 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Document Filed | |
April 09, 2020 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages At the request of Plaintiff's Attorney |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.