Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Hall, Joseph M, against Schmidts, Steven, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 04, 2012 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 05, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Filed Judgment Fully Satisfied | |
April 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Disposed | |
November 07, 2013 | Docket Event | Returned | |
August 27, 2013 | Docket Event | Applied | |
August 26, 2013 | Docket Event | Fee | |
June 04, 2013 | Docket Event | of Non-Military Service | |
June 04, 2013 | Docket Event | Conversion | |
June 04, 2013 | Docket Event | And Default Entered | |
January 16, 2013 | Docket Event | Returned Served | |
December 10, 2012 | Docket Event | Applied |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.