Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Meza, Juanroberto Ramos, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Meza, Christina, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Distaso, Joseph Richard presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 04, 2010 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 28, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 9999 | Docket Event | E-Case | |
December 02, 2010 | Docket Event | Declaration For Default Filed | |
December 02, 2010 | Docket Event | Petitioner's 191 Filed | |
December 02, 2010 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
October 22, 2010 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
August 06, 2010 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
June 23, 2010 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default Granted | |
May 06, 2010 | Docket Event | Disclosure Svc Declaration Filed | |
April 12, 2010 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause | |
March 23, 2010 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.