Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Trezvant, Fred S, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Trezvant, Marquita D, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Begen, Loretta Murphy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 02, 2010 |
CategoryDissolution Without Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 26, 2010 | Docket Event | Imaged File | |
June 02, 2010 | Docket Event | Law & Motion | |
June 02, 2010 | Docket Event | Dismissed/Lack of Prosecution | |
June 02, 2010 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
May 21, 2010 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
May 19, 2010 | Docket Event | Law and Motion Filed | |
March 02, 2010 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default Granted | |
December 18, 2009 | Docket Event | Summons | |
December 18, 2009 | Docket Event | Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.