Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Costa, Dennis Blaine, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Costa, Christie, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Distaso, Joseph Richard presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 21, 2010 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 9999 | Docket Event | E-Case | |
November 16, 2010 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
November 16, 2010 | Docket Event | Declaration For Default Filed | |
October 15, 2010 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
October 13, 2010 | Docket Event | Order | |
October 12, 2010 | Docket Event | Disclosure Svc Declaration Filed | |
September 03, 2010 | Docket Event | Order | |
August 06, 2010 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
May 07, 2010 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
January 21, 2010 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default Granted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.