Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Davis, Christopher Lee, Jr, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Davis, Jessica Marie, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Jacobson, Jack M presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 30, 2013 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 9999 | Docket Event | E-Case | |
July 10, 2013 | Docket Event | Request for Order | |
May 23, 2013 | Docket Event | Request for Order Filed | |
May 22, 2013 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Filed Denied | |
April 26, 2013 | Docket Event | Request for Order | |
January 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Court Trial | |
December 11, 2012 | Docket Event | Request for Order | |
November 08, 2012 | Docket Event | Request for Order Filed | |
November 07, 2012 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Filed Denied | |
October 02, 2012 | Docket Event | Request for Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.