Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Santana, Kelly Lee, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Castaneda, Lesly Karen, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Jacobson, Jack M presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 19, 2009 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 01, 2009 | Docket Event | Declaration For Default Filed | |
September 01, 2009 | Docket Event | Respondent's 191 Filed | |
September 01, 2009 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
August 25, 2009 | Docket Event | Order | |
August 24, 2009 | Docket Event | Disclosure Svc Declaration Filed | |
August 03, 2009 | Docket Event | Disclosure Svc Declaration Filed | |
June 19, 2009 | Docket Event | Order | |
June 17, 2009 | Docket Event | Appearance Stipulation & Waiver | |
June 01, 2009 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause | |
May 18, 2009 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.