Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Jenkins, Shannon Marie, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Douleh, Ronald, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Begen, Loretta Murphy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 12, 2009 |
CategoryDissolution Without Minor Children |
Last RefreshedMarch 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 31, 2011 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Issued | |
May 20, 2009 | Docket Event | Declaration For Default Filed | |
May 20, 2009 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
May 15, 2009 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause: CMC | |
May 11, 2009 | Docket Event | Order | |
April 20, 2009 | Docket Event | Order | |
April 06, 2009 | Docket Event | Disclosure Svc Declaration Filed | |
April 03, 2009 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
March 12, 2009 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default Granted | |
October 10, 2008 | Docket Event | Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.