Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Villegas, Stella D, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Garnica, Luciano L, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Distaso, Joseph Richard presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 18, 2009 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedMarch 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 22, 2009 | Docket Event | Petitioner's 191 Filed | |
October 22, 2009 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
October 16, 2009 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
September 18, 2009 | Docket Event | Order | |
August 28, 2009 | Docket Event | Court Trial | |
August 28, 2009 | Docket Event | Appearance Stipulation & Waiver | |
June 09, 2009 | Docket Event | Accounts Receivable- Fiscal | |
May 15, 2009 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
February 20, 2009 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
February 19, 2009 | Docket Event | Fees Mediation/Sanctions |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.