Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Dixon, Carolyn Ann, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Dixon, Jason Grant, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Jacobson, Jack M presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 05, 2009 |
CategoryDv Prevention With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedMarch 07, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 05, 2009 | Docket Event | Court Trial | |
September 04, 2008 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause | |
July 24, 2008 | Docket Event | Additional Fee Waiver Granted | |
July 24, 2008 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause | |
July 24, 2008 | Docket Event | Fee Waiver Granted | |
July 15, 2008 | Docket Event | Fee Waiver Granted | |
July 15, 2008 | Docket Event | Additional Fee Waiver Granted | |
June 24, 2008 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause | |
June 12, 2008 | Docket Event | Refer Fam Court Svcs | |
June 12, 2008 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence Hearing with Children |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.