Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Loretta Murphy Begen presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 25, 2009 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 16, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 26, 2009 | Docket Event | Order | |
March 25, 2009 | Docket Event | Fee Waiver Granted | |
November 19, 2008 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
November 19, 2008 | Docket Event | Declaration For Default Filed | |
October 22, 2008 | Docket Event | Order | |
October 10, 2008 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
September 10, 2008 | Docket Event | Fees Mediation/Sanctions | |
September 03, 2008 | Docket Event | Order | |
August 11, 2008 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default Granted | |
July 15, 2008 | Docket Event | Disclosure Svc Declaration Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.