Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Backman, David, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Backman, Jennifer, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Distaso, Joseph Richard presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 20, 2008 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 02, 2008 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
October 02, 2008 | Docket Event | Petitioner's 191 Filed | |
October 02, 2008 | Docket Event | Declaration For Default Filed | |
August 06, 2008 | Docket Event | Order | |
June 27, 2008 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
June 25, 2008 | Docket Event | Order | |
June 25, 2008 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default Granted | |
February 20, 2008 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause | |
December 28, 2007 | Docket Event | Summons | |
December 28, 2007 | Docket Event | Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.