Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case in the jurisdiction of York County, PA, . York County, PA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 28, 2023 |
CategoryCivil: Contract - Other |
Last RefreshedJanuary 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationYork County, PA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
NOTICE GIVEN RE: PA R. C. P. 236 MAILED
Date: July 11, 2023NOTICE NOTICE OF PRESENTATION OF MATTER AT CIVIL MOTIO...
Date: December 12, 2023NOTICE GIVEN RE: PA R. C. P. 236 (ORDER GRANTING 12/28...
Date: December 28, 2023NOTICE OF PRESENTATION OF MATTER AT CIVIL MOTION'S CT...
Date: October 26, 2023ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY BY T...
Date: November 14, 2023PRAECIPE FOR WRIT OF SUMMONS WITH WRIT ISSUED
Date: April 28, 2023COMPLAINT IN A CIVIL ACTION WITH CERT OF SVC
Date: June 08, 2023NOTICE GIVEN RE: PA R. C. P. 236 (ORDER DIRECTING 11/1...
Date: November 14, 2023Sheriff's Return - Civil Action - Writ of Summons (WOS...
Date: May 04, 2023ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SANCTIONS BY THE...
Date: December 28, 2023MOTION FOR SANCTIONS WITH CERT OF SVC
Date: December 12, 2023MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO DISCOVERY WITH CERT OF SVC
Date: October 26, 2023JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST DEFT FOR FAILURE T...
Date: July 11, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE GIVEN RE: PA R. C. P. 236 (ORDER GRANTING 12/28... NOTICE GIVEN RE: PA R. C. P. 236 |
|
December 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SANCTIONS BY THE... ORDER GRANTING MOTION |
|
December 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE NOTICE OF PRESENTATION OF MATTER AT CIVIL MOTIO... NOTICE OF PRESENTATION OF MOTION IN MOTION'S CT |
|
December 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR SANCTIONS WITH CERT OF SVC MOTION FOR SANCTIONS |
|
November 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY BY T... ORDER DIRECTING |
|
November 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE GIVEN RE: PA R. C. P. 236 (ORDER DIRECTING 11/1... NOTICE GIVEN RE: PA R. C. P. 236 |
|
October 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PRESENTATION OF MATTER AT CIVIL MOTION'S CT... NOTICE OF PRESENTATION OF MOTION IN MOTION'S CT |
|
October 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO DISCOVERY WITH CERT OF SVC MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO DISCOVERY |
|
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE GIVEN RE: PA R. C. P. 236 MAILED | |
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST DEFT FOR FAILURE T... JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.