Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Napa, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Dept. Of Child Support Services, against Potts, Joel K., in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with Michael S. Williams presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 21, 2008 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Cycle Time2521 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing 915310-Hearing: Review; County of Napa vs. Joel K. Potts ; Judge: J21980 Wood Victoria Additional Info : Mother's medical info. Judge: Wood, Victoria |
|
March 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Minute Order 913610-Minute Order Filed/Issued By: MINUTE ORDER [913610] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
|
March 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order 914210-Order Add'l Description: After Hearing Filed/Issued By: ORDER [914210] Motion: Additional Description : AFTER HEARING Filed By |
|
February 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service 912310-Proof of Service Filed/Issued By: 934310 - Attorney for Child Support Service PROOF OF SERVICE [912310] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR CHILD SUPPORT SERVICE [934310] |
|
February 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion 922210-Motion; County of Napa vs. Joel K. Potts Motion OSC Details: 921210 - Child Support ; Judge: J21980 Wood Victoria Judge: Wood, Victoria |
|
February 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
Minute Order 913610-Minute Order Filed/Issued By: 923110 - Clerk MINUTE ORDER [913610] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By CLERK [923110] |
|
February 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order 914210-Order Add'l Description: after hearing Filed/Issued By: 934310 - Attorney for Child Support Service ORDER [914210] Motion: Additional Description : AFTER HEARING Filed By ATTORNEY FOR CHILD SUPPORT SERVICE [934310] |
|
January 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service 912310-Proof of Service Filed/Issued By: 934310 - Attorney for Child Support Service PROOF OF SERVICE [912310] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR CHILD SUPPORT SERVICE [934310] |
|
December 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order 914210-Order Add'l Description: after hearing Filed/Issued By: 934310 - Attorney for Child Support Service ORDER [914210] Motion: Additional Description : AFTER HEARING Filed By ATTORNEY FOR CHILD SUPPORT SERVICE [934310] |
|
December 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
Minute Order 913610-Minute Order Filed/Issued By: 923110 - Clerk MINUTE ORDER [913610] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By CLERK [923110] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.