Case Last Refreshed: 4 hours ago
Lohan, Charles, Lohan, Melissa, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Pantano, Adam J, against Skepton Construction Inc, Skepton Construction, Inc., represented by Krebbs, Daniel D, in the jurisdiction of Philadelphia County, PA, . Philadelphia County, PA Superior Courts Magisterial District with Daniel J. Anders presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 19, 2024 |
CategoryPersonal Injury - Other |
Last RefreshedMay 04, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPhiladelphia County, PA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court HouseMagisterial District |
MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: April 25, 2024CERT MOTION IS CONTESTED
Date: April 15, 2024DISCOVERY MOTION FILED
Date: April 08, 2024ENTRY OF APPEARANCE
Date: April 05, 2024ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN
Date: April 25, 2024PRAE TO ISSUE WRIT OF SUMMONS
Date: 2024-03-19T00:00:00COMMENCEMENT CIVIL ACTION JURY
Date: 2024-03-19T00:00:00ACTIVE CASE
Date: 2024-03-19T00:00:00SHERIFF'S SERVICE
Date: April 01, 2024NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: April 25, 2024WAITING TO LIST CASE MGMT CONF
Date: 2024-03-19T00:00:00JURY TRIAL PERFECTED
Date: 2024-03-19T00:00:00DISCOVERY MOTION FILED
Date: April 25, 2024DISCOVERY MOTION FILED
Date:For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.