Soto, Amanda,
filed a(n)
Dram Shop
case
represented by
Arreola, Ramon A,
against
Amf Bowling Centers Holding Inc,
Bowlero Boothwyn,
Doe,
Duprey, Jailene,
Istar Bowling Centers I Inc,
(total of 10)
See All
in the jurisdiction of Philadelphia County, PA, .
Philadelphia County, PA
Superior Courts
.
Case Details for
Soto, Amanda v. Amf Bowling Centers Holding Inc
, et al.
Case Events for
Soto, Amanda v. Amf Bowling Centers Holding Inc
, et al.
Date
Type
Description
January 04, 2024
PRAECIPE TO REINSTATE CMPLT COMPLAINT WITH NOTICE TO DEFEND WITHIN TWENTY (20) DAYS AFTER SERVICE IN ACCORDANCE WITH RULE 1018.1 REINSTATED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF AMANDA SOTO)
December 19, 2023
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT UPON MARCO PEREZ BY CERTIFIED MAIL ON 12/11/2023 FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF AMANDA SOTO)
December 18, 2023
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT UPON JAILENE DUPREY BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 12/16/2023 FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF AMANDA SOTO)
December 07, 2023
WAITING TO LIST CASE MGMT CONF
December 07, 2023
JURY TRIAL PERFECTED
December 07, 2023
Docket Event
COMPLAINT FILED NOTICE GIVEN COMPLAINT WITH NOTICE TO DEFEND WITHIN TWENTY (20) DAYS AFTER SERVICE IN ACCORDANCE WITH RULE 1018.1 FILED.