Li, Austin,
filed a(n)
Automobile -
Torts
case
against
Allstate Fire And Casualty Insurance Company``,
in the jurisdiction of Philadelphia County, PA, .
Philadelphia County, PA
Superior Courts
with OVERTON, GEORGE W presiding.
Case Details for
Li, Austin v. Allstate Fire And Casualty Insurance Company``
Case Events for
Li, Austin v. Allstate Fire And Casualty Insurance Company``
Date
Type
Description
September 19, 2024
Docket Event
ARBITRATION HEARING ARBITRATION CENTER 1880 JFK BLVD 5TH FLOOR
Judge: unassigned
December 08, 2023
Docket Event
AFF OF DEPOSIT-MINR/INCAP PERS AFFIDAVIT OF DEPOSIT PURSUANT TO ORDER OF COURT REGARDING MINOR'S COMPROMISE/SETTLEMENT. (FILED ON BEHALF OF AUSTIN LI AND ANGELA YU)
December 06, 2023
Docket Event
NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236 NOTICE GIVEN ON 06-DEC-2023 OF ORD MINORS CMP PET GRANTED/DSP ENTERED ON 06-DEC-2023.
December 06, 2023
Docket Event
ORD MINORS CMP PET GRANTED/DSP 81-23113981 UPON CONSIDERATION OF THE PETITION FOR LEAVE TO COMPROMISE A MINOR?S ACTION, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AND DECREED THAT PETITIONER IS AUTHORIZED TO ENTER INTO A SETTLEMENT WITH DEFENDANT. DISTRIBUTION SHALL BE MADE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TERMS OF THE ORDER. SEE ORDER FOR FULL TERMS. ?BY THE COURT: OVERTON, J., 12.06.2023
November 16, 2023
Docket Event
MOTION ASSIGNED 81-23113981 MOT-APP & DIST OF MINOR'S COMP ASSIGNED TO JUDGE: OVERTON, GEORGE W. ON DATE: NOVEMBER 16, 2023
November 16, 2023
Docket Event
MOT-APP & DIST OF MINOR'S COMP 81-23113981 MOT-APP & DIST OF MINOR'S COMP (FILED ON BEHALF OF AUSTIN LI AND ANGELA YU)
November 10, 2023
Docket Event
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S WRIT OF SUMMONS UPON ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY`` BY CERTIFIED MAIL ON 11/10/2023 FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF AUSTIN LI AND ANGELA YU)
November 09, 2023
Docket Event
ARBITRATION HEARING SCHEDULED SCHEDULED FOR ARBITRATION HEARING ON SEPTEMBER 19, 2024, AT 09:15 AM AT THE ARBITRATION CENTER, 1880 JFK BLVD 5TH FLOOR.
November 07, 2023
Docket Event
PRAE TO ISSUE WRIT OF SUMMONS PRAECIPE TO ISSUE WRIT OF SUMMONS FILED. WRIT OF SUMMONS ISSUED.