Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Franklin Towne Charter High School, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case represented by Dang, Miranda L, against Board Of Education Of The School District Of Philadelphia, School District Of Philadelphia, The School District Of Philadelphia, represented by Silver, Samuel W, in the jurisdiction of Philadelphia County, PA, . Philadelphia County, PA Superior Courts with PATRICK, PAULA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 16, 2023 |
CategoryEquity - No Real Estate (Tro) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 17, 2024 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationPhiladelphia County, PA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
NOTICE GIVEN
Date: January 06, 2024MOTION TO AMEND
Date: January 05, 2024PRELIMINARY OBJECTIONS
Date: January 04, 2024PRELIM OBJECTIONS-MARKED MOOT
Date: January 04, 2024LISTED FOR CASE MGMT CONF
Date: January 04, 2024ENTRY OF APPEARANCE-CO COUNSEL
Date: December 29, 2023NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: December 28, 2023ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN
Date: December 28, 2023MOTION HEARING SCHEDULED
Date: 2023-12-28T00:00:00WAITING TO LIST MOTION HEARING
Date: 2023-12-28T00:00:00MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: 2023-12-28T00:00:00MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE
Date: 2023-12-28T00:00:00PRELIMINARY OBJECTIONS
Date: 2023-12-08T00:00:00JURY TRIAL PERFECTED
Date: 2023-12-28T00:00:00AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2023-12-28T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2023-11-30T00:00:00ENTRY OF APPEARANCE-CO COUNSEL
Date: 2023-12-08T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2023-11-29T00:00:00PRELIM OBJECTIONS ASSIGNED
Date: 2023-11-29T00:00:00MOTION HEARING SCHEDULED
Date: 2023-11-29T00:00:00ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2023-11-30T00:00:00MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: 2023-11-29T00:00:00RULE ISSUED
Date: 2023-11-29T00:00:00AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2023-11-28T00:00:00PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION
Date: 2023-11-27T00:00:00ENTRY OF APPEARANCE
Date: 2023-10-17T00:00:00PRELIMINARY OBJECTIONS
Date: 2023-11-06T00:00:00WAITING TO LIST CASE MGMT CONF
Date: 2023-10-17T00:00:00ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2023-10-17T00:00:00MOTION ASSIGNMENT UPDATED
Date: 2023-10-17T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2023-10-17T00:00:00TRANSFERRED TO MAJOR NON-JURY
Date: 2023-10-17T00:00:00MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: 2023-10-16T00:00:00PRELIMINARY OBJECTIONS
Date:COMMENCEMENT OF CIVIL ACTION
Date: 2023-10-16T00:00:00PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION
Date: 2023-11-28T00:00:00MOTION/PETITION/STIP WITHDRAWN
Date: 2023-10-17T00:00:00PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION
Date: 2023-10-16T00:00:00WAITING TO LIST CASE MGMT CONF
Date: 2023-10-16T00:00:00ACTIVE CASE
Date: 2023-10-16T00:00:00ENTRY OF APPEARANCE
Date: 2023-10-16T00:00:00ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2023-10-17T00:00:00MOTION TO AMEND
Date:COMPLAINT FILED NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2023-10-16T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.