U S Bank Trust National Association Not In Its Individual,
U.S. Bank Trust National Association, Not In Its Individual,
filed a(n)
Landlord-Tenant -
Property
case
represented by
Hunsberger, Adrienna,
against
Hatchell, Rasheeka N,
Thomas, Marquis,
Thomas, Marvin,
Unknown Heirs Successors Assigns And All Persons Firms,
Unknown Heirs, Successors, Assigns And All Persons, Firms,
(total of 5)
See All
in the jurisdiction of Philadelphia County, PA, .
Philadelphia County, PA
Superior Courts
with MOORE, MARK presiding.
Case Details for
U S Bank Trust National Association Not In Its Individual v. Hatchell, Rasheeka N
, et al.
Case Events for
U S Bank Trust National Association Not In Its Individual v. Hatchell, Rasheeka N
, et al.
Date
Type
Description
February 01, 2024
Hearing
STATUS CONFERENCE CITY HALL COURTROOM 676
Judge: unassigned
November 06, 2023
Docket Event
NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236 NOTICE GIVEN ON 07-NOV-2023 OF WAITING-LIST CONCL-SERV ISSUE ENTERED ON 06-NOV-2023.
November 06, 2023
Docket Event
WAITING-LIST CONCL-SERV ISSUE UPON CONSIDERATION OF THE INFORMATION PROVIDED TO THE COURT, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AND DECREED THAT THE COMPLAINT AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER HAVING NOT BEEN SERVED ON DEFENDANT(S), THE FIRST CONCILIATION CONFERENCE IS CANCELLED AND RESCHEDULED TO DATE: 2/1/2024 at 9:00 A.M. DEFENDANT(S) MAY PARTICIPATE IN THE CONFERENCE VIA TELEPHONE OR ZOOM, IN ACCORDANCE WITH ATTACHED INSTRUCTIONS, OR MAY APPEAR IN PERSON IN THE COURTROOM 676, CITY HALL, PHILADELPHIA, PA. **PLAINTIFF IS STAYED FROM ENTERING A DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT(S) BEFORE ONE DAY AFTER THE SECOND CONCILIATION CONFERENCE OCCURS OR UNTIL SUCH TIME AS IS STATED IN THE SUBSEQUENT ORDER** BY THE COURT: S.T. STREET, J., 11/6/2023
November 06, 2023
Docket Event
LISTED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR DATE 2/1/2024 at 9:00 A.M. COURTROOM 676 CITY HALL, PHILADELPHIA
November 01, 2023
Docket Event
PRAECIPE TO REINSTATE CMPLT COMPLAINT WITH NOTICE TO DEFEND WITHIN TWENTY (20) DAYS AFTER SERVICE IN ACCORDANCE WITH RULE 1018.1 REINSTATED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF U S BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL)
September 22, 2023
Docket Event
PRAECIPE TO REINSTATE CMPLT COMPLAINT WITH NOTICE TO DEFEND WITHIN TWENTY (20) DAYS AFTER SERVICE IN ACCORDANCE WITH RULE 1018.1 REINSTATED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF U S BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL)
August 22, 2023
Docket Event
SHERIFF'S SERVICE DEPUTIZED SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND NOTICE OF MEDIATION UPON BY SHERIFF OF DELAWARE COUNTY ON 08/14/2023. (FILED ON BEHALF OF U S BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL)
August 03, 2023
Docket Event
CONCILIATION CONF SCHEDULED none.
August 03, 2023
Docket Event
NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236 NOTICE GIVEN ON 04-AUG-2023 OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER ISSUED ENTERED ON 03-AUG-2023.
August 03, 2023
Docket Event
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER ISSUED PURSUANT TO THE TERMS OF THE RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE DIVERSION PROGRAM ADOPTED BY JOINT GENERAL COURT REGULATION 2008-01, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AND DECREED AS FOLLOWS: 1) SCHEDULING OF CONCILIATION CONFERENCE: A CONCILIATION CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR NOVEMBER 2, 2023 AT 1:00 P.M. DUE TO THE ONGOING COVID-19 PANDEMIC, THE DEFENDANT(S)-HOMEOWNER(S) MAY PARTICIPATE IN THE CONCILIATION CONFERENCE IN PERSON OR REMOTELY. THE ATTACHED ?HOW TO PARTICIPATE? SHEET OUTLINES THE WAYS TO PARTICIPATE. 2) SERVICE: PLAINTIFF SHALL SERVE A COPY OF THIS ORDER INCLUDING THE ?HOW TO PARTICIPATE? SHEET AND ?IMPORTANT NOTICE? ON DEFENDANT(S)-HOMEOWNER(S) TOGETHER WITH THE COMPLAINT AS REQUIRED BY PA.R.C.P. NO. 400.1. 3) JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT: AS PROVIDED BY SECTION 4 (F) OF JOINT GENERAL COURT REGULATION NO. 2008-01, IF THE COMPLAINT IS SERVED ON DEFENDANT(S) AS REQUIRED BY RULES OF COURT, BUT A RESPONSIVE PLEADING OR PRELIMINARY OBJECTIONS ARE NOT FILED AS REQUIRED BY PA.R.C.P. NO. 1026 AND 1028, THE PLAINTIFF MAY, AS APPROPRIATE, SERVE A ?TEN-DAY NOTICE? AS AUTHORIZED BY PA.R.C.P. NO. 237.1 ON DEFENDANT(S), BUT MAY NOT OBTAIN JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT UNTIL SUCH TIME AS THE COURT PERMITS IN AN ORDER FOLLOWING ONE OR MORE CONCILIATION CONFERENCES. PLAINTIFF MAY SEEK RELIEF FROM THIS PROVISION BY FILING A MOTION. 4) MEETING WITH HOUSING COUNSELOR: THE DEFENDANT(S)-HOMEOWNER(S) SHALL IMMEDIATELY CALL THE SAVE YOUR HOME PHILLY HOTLINE AT 215-334-HOME (215-334-4663), TO SCHEDULE AN APPOINTMENT TO DISCUSS WITH A HOUSING COUNSELOR AVAILABLE OPTIONS FOR RESOLUTION OF THE MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE ACTION. THE HOUSING COUNSELOR SHALL PREPARE A PROPOSAL AND SUBMIT IT TO PLAINTIFF?S ATTORNEY AS SOON AS POSSIBLE, PREFERABLY TEN (10) DAYS BEFORE THE DATE OF THE NEXT CONCILIATION CONFERENCE. THE FAILURE OF THE DEFENDANT(S)-HOMEOWNER(S) TO MEET WITH A HOUSING COUNSELOR OR CALL THE SAVE YOUR HOME PHILLY HOTLINE MAY RESULT IN THE ENTRY OF AN ORDER AUTHORIZING THE PLAINTIFF TO PROCEED WITH THE ACTION AND THE ULTIMATE SALE OF THE PREMISES AT SHERIFF?S SALE. 5) CONCILIATION CONFERENCE: ALL PARTIES SHALL PARTICIPATE IN THE CONCILIATION CONFERENCE. A REPRESENTATIVE OF THE PLAINTIFF OR INVESTOR WHO HAS ACTUAL AUTHORITY TO MODIFY MORTGAGES, TO ENTER INTO ALTERNATE PAYMENT AGREEMENTS WITH THE DEFENDANT, OR TO OTHERWISE RESOLVE THE ACTION SHALL BE PRESENT AT THE CONCILIATION CONFERENCE OR SHALL BE AVAILABLE TELEPHONICALLY. AN ORDER WILL BE ISSUED FOLLOWING THE CONCILIATION CONFERENCE. BY THE COURT: HONORABLE IDEE C. FOX HONORABLE LISETTE SHIRDAN-HARRIS President Judge Administrative Judge, Trial Division Court of Common Pleas Court of Common Pleas