Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Hughes, Briana, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Kelly, Kevin P, against Doe, Nguyen, James T, Tang, Nora, represented by Ackley, Christopher, in the jurisdiction of Philadelphia County, PA, . Philadelphia County, PA Superior Courts with HANGLEY, MICHELE D presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 28, 2023 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedJanuary 17, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPhiladelphia County, PA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED
Date: September 05, 2023PRAEC/SETTLE DISCONTINUE END
Date: November 03, 2023AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: August 11, 2023AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: August 04, 2023REPLY TO NEW MATTER
Date: September 06, 2023ENTRY OF APPEARANCE
Date: August 22, 2023ACTIVE CASE
Date: July 28, 2023COMMENCEMENT OF CIVIL ACTION
Date: July 28, 2023COMPLAINT FILED NOTICE GIVEN
Date: July 28, 2023ARBITRATION HEARING SCHEDULED
Date: 2023-07-28T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.