Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Gerretz, Angie M., filed a(n) Class Action case represented by Solomon 760, Stephanie L, against Acme Markets Inc, represented by Malloy, Elizabeth A, in the jurisdiction of Philadelphia County, PA, . Philadelphia County, PA Superior Courts with Paula A. Patrick presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 29, 2023 |
CategoryClass Action |
Last RefreshedJanuary 17, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationPhiladelphia County, PA |
|
ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN
Date: September 25, 2023ENTRY OF APPEARANCE
Date: August 30, 2023MOTION TO DISCONTINUE
Date: August 29, 2023COMPLAINT FILED NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2023-06-29T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: September 25, 2023NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2023-07-20T00:00:00MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: September 21, 2023CONFERENCE DATE SET
Date: 2023-07-20T00:00:00ORDER ENTERED - FINAL DISPOS
Date: September 25, 2023ACTIVE CASE
Date: 2023-06-29T00:00:00JURY TRIAL PERFECTED
Date: 2023-06-29T00:00:00COMMENCEMENT CIVIL ACTION JURY
Date: 2023-06-29T00:00:00LISTED FOR CASE MGMT CONF
Date: 2023-07-20T00:00:00WAITING TO LIST CASE MGMT CONF
Date: 2023-06-29T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.