Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Rosario, Aileen Y, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against All Occupants, Daniells, Lenora, represented by Valle, Peter A, in the jurisdiction of Philadelphia County, PA, . Philadelphia County, PA Superior Courts with HILL, GLYNNIS presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 27, 2023 |
CategoryEjectment |
Last RefreshedJanuary 18, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPhiladelphia County, PA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: August 17, 2023STIPULATION FILED
Date: August 16, 2023ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2023-06-27T00:00:00ENTRY OF APPEARANCE
Date: August 16, 2023LISTED IN TRIAL READY POOL
Date: 2023-04-27T00:00:00STIPULATION ASSIGNED
Date: August 16, 2023JUDGMENT ENTERED BY AGREEMENT
Date: August 17, 2023NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2023-06-27T00:00:00LISTED FOR TRIAL
Date: July 28, 2023ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2023-07-13T00:00:00WAITING TO LIST FOR TRIAL
Date: July 28, 2023PRELIMINARY OBJECTIONS
Date: 2023-05-15T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN
Date: July 28, 2023NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: July 28, 2023NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2023-04-27T00:00:00PRELIM OBJECTIONS ASSIGNED
Date: 2023-06-07T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER ISSUED
Date: 2023-04-27T00:00:00PETITION TO OPEN JUDGMENT
Date: 2023-03-31T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2023-01-27T00:00:00ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2023-04-24T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2023-04-25T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2023-02-14T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2023-04-24T00:00:00LISTED FOR CASE MGMT CONF
Date: 2023-04-03T00:00:00JUDGMENT ENTERED BY DEFAULT
Date: 2023-03-22T00:00:00SHERIFF'S SURCHARGE 2 DEFTS
Date: 2023-01-27T00:00:00COMMENCEMENT OF CIVIL ACTION
Date: 2023-01-27T00:00:00CASE MGMT CONFERENCE COMPLETED
Date: 2023-04-27T00:00:00ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2023-04-25T00:00:00ACTIVE CASE
Date: 2023-01-27T00:00:00MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: 2023-04-25T00:00:00MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: 2023-04-04T00:00:00MOT-PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS
Date: 2023-03-31T00:00:00WAITING TO LIST CASE MGMT CONF
Date: 2023-01-31T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2023-04-05T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.