Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Board Of Revision Of Taxes filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case in the jurisdiction of Philadelphia County, PA, . Philadelphia County, PA Superior Courts with EMERGENCY JUDGE, JUDGE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2022 |
CategoryBoard Of Revision Of Taxes-Mva |
Last RefreshedJanuary 17, 2024 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationPhiladelphia County, PA |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER ISSUED
Date: 2022-12-27T00:00:00ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2023-07-21T00:00:00LISTED-PROJ. PRE-TRIAL CONF
Date: 2023-04-11T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2023-04-11T00:00:00STIPULATION - FINAL DISPO
Date: September 27, 2023STIPULATION FILED
Date: September 26, 2023STIPULATION ASSIGNED
Date: September 27, 2023NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: September 27, 2023LISTED FOR PRE-TRIAL CONF
Date: 2023-07-21T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2023-07-11T00:00:00LISTED FOR TRIAL
Date: September 13, 2023NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2023-07-21T00:00:00MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: 2023-07-11T00:00:00LISTED FOR CASE MGMT CONF
Date: 2023-02-10T00:00:00WAITING TO LIST FOR TRIAL
Date: September 13, 2023RETURNED MAIL RECEIVED
Date: July 26, 2023WAITING TO LIST PRE-TRIAL CONF
Date: 2023-04-11T00:00:00ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2023-07-11T00:00:00WAITING/ISSUE SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: 2022-12-28T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: September 13, 2023ENTRY OF APPEARANCE
Date: 2023-01-13T00:00:00WAITING TO LIST PRE-TRIAL CONF
Date: 2023-07-21T00:00:00EMERGENCY MOTION/PET FILED
Date: 2023-07-11T00:00:00ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN
Date: September 13, 2023NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2023-02-10T00:00:00ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2023-04-11T00:00:00ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2023-02-10T00:00:00ACTIVE CASE
Date: 2022-12-27T00:00:00NOTICE OF STATUTORY APPEAL
Date: 2022-12-27T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.