Sun Federal Credit Union,
filed a(n)
Breach of Contract -
Commercial
case
represented by
Dougherty, Michael J,
against
Daniels, Rakiera,
in the jurisdiction of Philadelphia County, PA, .
Philadelphia County, PA
Superior Courts
with TURNER, CAROLINE presiding.
Case Details for
Sun Federal Credit Union v. Daniels, Rakiera
Case Events for
Sun Federal Credit Union v. Daniels, Rakiera
Date
Type
Description
October 26, 2023
Hearing
ARBITRATION HEARING ARBITRATION CENTER 1880 JFK BLVD 5TH FLOOR
March 24, 2023
Docket Event
JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT/FINAL DISP PRAECIPE FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED. JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF SUN FEDERAL CREDIT UNION AND AGAINST RAKIERA DANIELS FOR FAILURE TO FILE ANSWER WITHIN REQUIRED TIME. PRO-PROTHONOTARY. NOTICE UNDER RULE 236 GIVEN. NOTICE UNDER 237.1 GIVEN. AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE FILED. DAMAGES ASSESSED: $19,118.98
January 16, 2023
Docket Event
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT UPON RAKIERA DANIELS BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 01/16/2023 FILED.
December 27, 2022
Docket Event
ACTIVE CASE E-Filing Number: 2212049931
December 27, 2022
Docket Event
ARBITRATION HEARING SCHEDULED SCHEDULED FOR ARBITRATION HEARING ON OCTOBER 26, 2023, AT 09:15 AM AT THE ARBITRATION CENTER, 1880 JFK BLVD 5TH FLOOR.
December 27, 2022
Docket Event
COMMENCEMENT OF CIVIL ACTION none.
December 27, 2022
Docket Event
COMPLAINT FILED NOTICE GIVEN COMPLAINT WITH NOTICE TO DEFEND WITHIN TWENTY (20) DAYS AFTER SERVICE IN ACCORDANCE WITH RULE 1018.1 FILED.