Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
O'Neill, William, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Mccabe, Kristy E, against Doe, Lowe'S Companies Inc, Lowe'S Home Centers Llc, Weiss, Cary, represented by Cohen, David S, in the jurisdiction of Philadelphia County, PA, . Philadelphia County, PA Superior Courts with HILL, GLYNNIS presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 10, 2022 |
CategoryPremises Liability, Slip/Fall |
Last RefreshedJanuary 19, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPhiladelphia County, PA |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
LISTED-PROJ. PRE-TRIAL CONF
Date: January 10, 2024WAITING TO LIST SETTLMNT CONF
Date: January 10, 2024REVISED CASE MGMT ORDER ISSUED
Date: January 10, 2024LISTED-PROJ. SETTLEMENT CONF.
Date: January 10, 2024NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2024-01-10T00:00:00LISTED FOR TRIAL
Date: 2024-01-10T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2023-12-18T00:00:00OTHER EVENT CANCELLED
Date: 2024-01-10T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2024-01-10T00:00:00LISTED RULE RETURNABLE DATE
Date: 2023-12-18T00:00:00ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2024-01-10T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2023-01-12T00:00:00PREL OBJECT-ASSIGNMENT UPDATED
Date: 2023-11-28T00:00:00ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2023-12-18T00:00:00LISTED-PROJ. SETTLEMENT CONF.
Date: 2023-01-25T00:00:00PRAECIPE TO REINSTATE CMPLT
Date: 2023-09-18T00:00:00MOTION TO WITHDRAW APPEARANCE
Date: 2023-11-17T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2023-01-25T00:00:00ANSWER TO PRELIMINARY OBJCTNS
Date: 2023-11-16T00:00:00PRELIM OBJECTIONS ASSIGNED
Date: 2023-11-22T00:00:00PRELIMINARY OBJECTIONS
Date: 2023-10-27T00:00:00PRAECIPE TO REINSTATE CMPLT
Date: 2023-04-10T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER ISSUED
Date: 2023-01-25T00:00:00SHERIFF'S SERVICE
Date: 2023-10-24T00:00:00PRAECIPE TO REINSTATE CMPLT
Date: 2023-10-05T00:00:00LISTED FOR TRIAL
Date: 2023-01-25T00:00:00ATTEMPTED SERVICE - NOT FOUND
Date: 2023-10-05T00:00:00CASE MGMT CONFERENCE COMPLETED
Date: 2023-01-25T00:00:00LISTED FOR CASE MGMT CONF
Date: 2023-01-10T00:00:00ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2023-04-11T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2023-12-13T00:00:00PRAECIPE TO REINSTATE CMPLT
Date: 2023-08-17T00:00:00MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: 2023-11-17T00:00:00LISTED-PROJ. PRE-TRIAL CONF
Date: 2023-01-25T00:00:00ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2023-12-13T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2022-11-10T00:00:00WAITING TO LIST CASE MGMT CONF
Date: 2022-11-10T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2022-12-09T00:00:00JURY TRIAL PERFECTED
Date: 2022-12-09T00:00:00ACTIVE CASE
Date: 2022-11-10T00:00:00SHERIFF'S SERVICE
Date: 2022-12-28T00:00:00JURY TRIAL PERFECTED
Date: 2022-11-10T00:00:00PRAECIPE TO REINSTATE CMPLT
Date: 2022-12-27T00:00:00ENTRY OF APPEARANCE
Date: 2022-12-09T00:00:00STIPULATION FILED
Date: 2022-12-12T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2022-12-09T00:00:00PRAECIPE TO REINSTATE CMPLT
Date: 2022-11-21T00:00:00COMMENCEMENT CIVIL ACTION JURY
Date: 2022-11-10T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.