Wood, Derrick,
filed a(n)
Automobile -
Torts
case
represented by
Zafran, Jared S,
against
Does,
Pa Financial Responsibility Assigned Claims Plan,
represented by
Fabro, Tristin A,
in the jurisdiction of Philadelphia County, PA, .
Philadelphia County, PA
Superior Courts
with TURNER, CAROLINE presiding.
NOTICE GIVEN- PA.R.C.P. #1307 NOTICE GIVEN ON 23-AUG-2023 OF REPORT & AWARD OF ARBITRATORS ENTERED ON 23-AUG-2023.
August 23, 2023
Docket Event
REPORT & AWARD OF ARBITRATORS WE FIND IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANT PA FINANCIAL RESPONSIBILITY ASSIGNED CLAIMS PLAN.
August 23, 2023
Hearing
ARBITRATION HEARING ARBITRATION CENTER 1880 JFK BLVD 5TH FLOOR
July 05, 2023
Docket Event
REPLY TO NEW MATTER OF PA FINANCIAL RESPONSIBILITY ASSIGNED CLAIMS PLAN FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF DERRICK WOOD)
June 30, 2023
Docket Event
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED ANSWER WITH NEW MATTER AND CROSSCLAIM TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF PA FINANCIAL RESPONSIBILITY ASSIGNED CLAIMS PLAN)
October 31, 2022
Docket Event
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE OF TRISTIN A FABRO FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF PA FINANCIAL RESPONSIBILITY ASSIGNED CLAIMS PLAN)
October 25, 2022
Docket Event
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT UPON PA FINANCIAL RESPONSIBILITY ASSIGNED CLAIMS PLAN BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 10/21/2022 FILED.
October 21, 2022
Docket Event
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE-CO COUNSEL ENTRY OF APPEARANCE OF JONATHAN GRAU AS CO-COUNSEL FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF DERRICK WOOD)
October 20, 2022
Docket Event
COMPLAINT FILED NOTICE GIVEN COMPLAINT WITH NOTICE TO DEFEND WITHIN TWENTY (20) DAYS AFTER SERVICE IN ACCORDANCE WITH RULE 1018.1 FILED.
October 20, 2022
Docket Event
ARBITRATION HEARING SCHEDULED SCHEDULED FOR ARBITRATION HEARING ON AUGUST 23, 2023, AT 09:15 AM AT THE ARBITRATION CENTER, 1880 JFK BLVD 5TH FLOOR.