Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Broomer Iii, Albert, Brown, Dwayne, James, Rita, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Delaney, Michael A, against Dempster, Siafa, Doe, John, Samuel, Crystal, represented by Kannengieszer, Amanda E, in the jurisdiction of Philadelphia County, PA, . Philadelphia County, PA Superior Courts with Linda Carpenter presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 20, 2022 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedJanuary 17, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPhiladelphia County, PA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
COMPLAINT FILED NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2022-10-20T00:00:00WAITING TO LIST CASE MGMT CONF
Date: 2022-10-20T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2022-11-15T00:00:00WAITING TO LIST CASE MGMT CONF
Date: 2022-12-14T00:00:00LISTED-PROJ. SETTLEMENT CONF.
Date: January 04, 2023CASE MGMT CONFERENCE COMPLETED
Date: January 04, 2023LISTED-PROJ. PRE-TRIAL CONF
Date: January 04, 2023PRAEC/SETTLE DISCONTINUE END
Date: September 14, 2023NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2022-12-22T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN
Date: September 13, 2023LISTED FOR TRIAL
Date: 2023-01-04T00:00:00TRANSFERRED TO MAJOR JURY
Date: 2022-12-14T00:00:00LISTED FOR CASE MGMT CONF
Date: 2022-12-20T00:00:00LISTED FOR SETTLEMENT CONF
Date: September 10, 2023CONFERENCE DATE SET
Date: September 10, 2023NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2023-01-04T00:00:00ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2022-12-20T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2022-11-10T00:00:00ACTIVE CASE
Date: 2022-10-20T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER ISSUED
Date: 2023-01-04T00:00:00JURY TRIAL PERFECTED
Date: 2022-12-14T00:00:00ENTRY OF APPEARANCE
Date: 2022-12-14T00:00:00COMMENCEMENT OF CIVIL ACTION
Date: 2022-10-20T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.