Payne, Porsche,
filed a(n)
Breach of Contract -
Commercial
case
represented by
Shayna, Shorr,
Shorr, Shayna N,
against
Lm General Insurance Company,
represented by
Kannengieszer, Amanda E,
in the jurisdiction of Philadelphia County, PA, .
Philadelphia County, PA
Superior Courts
with FLETMAN, ABBE presiding.
Case Details for
Payne, Porsche v. Lm General Insurance Company
Case Events for
Payne, Porsche v. Lm General Insurance Company
Date
Type
Description
October 04, 2023
Docket Event
PRAEC/SETTLE DISCONTINUE END SETTLED VIA S D & E PRAECIPE FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF PORSCHE PAYNE)
August 23, 2023
Hearing
ARBITRATION HEARING ARBITRATION CENTER 1880 JFK BLVD 5TH FLOOR
August 15, 2023
Docket Event
SETTLED PRIOR TO ARBITRATION THE ARBITRATION CENTER HAVING BEEN ADVISED THAT THE WITHIN CASE HAS BEEN SETTLED, THE CASE SHALL BE MARKED "DISCONTINUED" ON THE PROTHONOTARY'S DOCKET AND REMOVED FROM THE APPLICABLE LIST AND INVENTORY OF PENDING CASES. THIS CASE MAY BE RESTORED TO THE ARBITRATION LIST ONLY UPON WRITTEN ORDER OF THE MOTION PROGRAM JUDGE. THIS RELIEF SHALL BE REQUESTED BY FORMAL MOTION. IT IS FURTHER DIRECTED THAT IN THE FOLLOWING TYPES OF CASES ADDITIONAL STEPS MUST BE TAKEN TO OFFICIALLY CONCLUDE THE CASE: MINOR'S COMPROMISES, INCOMPETENT/INCAPACITATED PERSON'S COMPROMISES, WRONGFUL DEATH/SURVIVAL ACTIONS (SEE PA. R.C.P. 2039,2064,2206, PHILA CIV. R. NO.2039.1, 2206, AND JOINT GENERAL COURT REGULATION 97-1) AND JOINDER (SEE PA. R.C.P. 2231). ARBITRATION CENTER MANAGEMENT.
August 15, 2023
Docket Event
FILE COPY PRINTED none.
August 15, 2023
Docket Event
NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236 NOTICE GIVEN ON 15-AUG-2023 OF SETTLED PRIOR TO ARBITRATION ENTERED ON 15-AUG-2023.
February 10, 2023
Docket Event
NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236 NOTICE GIVEN ON 10-FEB-2023 OF ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN ENTERED ON 10-FEB-2023.
February 10, 2023
Docket Event
ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN 86-23013686 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AND DECREED THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFF SHALL FORWARD FULL AND COMPLETE ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S INTERROGATORIES AND REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, WITHIN TWENTY (20) DAYS OF DOCKETING THIS ORDER OR MAY RISK SANCTIONS UPON APPLICATION TO THE COURT.......................BY THE COURT: FLETMAN, J. 02/10/2023
February 08, 2023
Docket Event
MOTION ASSIGNED 86-23013686 DISCOVERY MOTION FILED ASSIGNED TO JUDGE: FLETMAN, ABBE F. ON DATE: FEBRUARY 08, 2023
January 25, 2023
Docket Event
CERT MOTION IS CONTESTED 86-23013686 MOTION IS CONTESTED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF LM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY)
January 23, 2023
Docket Event
DISCOVERY MOTION FILED 86-23013686 MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS. CERTIFICATION DUE DATE: 01/30/2023. RESPONSE DATE: 02/06/2023. (FILED ON BEHALF OF LM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY)