Negron, Pedro J,
filed a(n)
Breach of Contract -
Commercial
case
represented by
Gallant, Scott R,
against
Allstate Property And Casualty Insurance Company,
represented by
Waller, Kristin M,
in the jurisdiction of Philadelphia County, PA, .
Philadelphia County, PA
Superior Courts
with FLETMAN, ABBE presiding.
Case Details for
Negron, Pedro J v. Allstate Property And Casualty Insurance Company
Case Events for
Negron, Pedro J v. Allstate Property And Casualty Insurance Company
Date
Type
Description
August 23, 2023
Hearing
ARBITRATION HEARING ARBITRATION CENTER 1880 JFK BLVD 5TH FLOOR
April 25, 2023
Docket Event
PRAEC/SETTLE DISCONTINUE END SETTLED VIA S D & E PRAECIPE FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF ALLSTATE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY)
March 14, 2023
Docket Event
ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN 29-23022429 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AND DECREED THAT SAID MOTION IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFF(S), PEDRO NEGRON, SHALL, WITHIN TWENTY (20) DAYS OF THE DOCKETING OF THIS ORDER, PROVIDE FULL AND COMPLETE RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT(S)' INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION. FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER MAY, UPON MOTION, RESULT IN MONETARY SANCTIONS. ALL DOCUMENTS PRODUCED OR WITHHELD ARE TO BE NUMBERED CONSECUTIVELY. BEGINNING WITH THE NUMBER "1".....................BY THE COURT: FLETMAN, J. 03/14/2023
March 14, 2023
Docket Event
NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236 NOTICE GIVEN ON 14-MAR-2023 OF ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN ENTERED ON 14-MAR-2023.
March 07, 2023
Docket Event
MOTION ASSIGNED 29-23022429 DISCOVERY MOTION FILED ASSIGNED TO JUDGE: FLETMAN, ABBE F. ON DATE: MARCH 07, 2023
February 14, 2023
Docket Event
CERT MOTION IS CONTESTED 29-23022429 MOTION IS CONTESTED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF ALLSTATE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY)
February 10, 2023
Docket Event
DISCOVERY MOTION FILED 29-23022429 MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS. CERTIFICATION DUE DATE: 02/17/2023. RESPONSE DATE: 02/24/2023. (FILED ON BEHALF OF ALLSTATE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY)
December 14, 2022
Docket Event
REPLY TO NEW MATTER OF ALLSTATE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF PEDRO J NEGRON)
December 13, 2022
Docket Event
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED ANSWER WITH NEW MATTER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF ALLSTATE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY)
November 17, 2022
Docket Event
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT UPON ALLSTATE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY BY CERTIFIED MAIL ON 10/31/2022 FILED. (FILED ON BEHALF OF PEDRO J NEGRON)