Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Booker, Wayne, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Saffren Esq, Kenneth S, against City Of Philadelphia, Does I Through X, John, Harris, Eugene, Xyz Companies I Through X, represented by Cordero, Nilenia M, Merrigan, Eamon, in the jurisdiction of Philadelphia County, PA, . Philadelphia County, PA Superior Courts with FLETMAN, ABBE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 20, 2022 |
CategoryPremises Liability, Slip/Fall |
Last RefreshedJanuary 19, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPhiladelphia County, PA |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
CERT MOTION IS WITHDRAWN
Date: November 06, 2023CERT MOTION IS CONTESTED
Date: October 31, 2023CITY CHARGE SUBSEQUENT FILINGS
Date: October 31, 2023NOTICE GIVEN
Date: November 02, 2023ARBITRATION HEARING SCHEDULED
Date: October 31, 2023DISCOVERY MOTION FILED
Date: October 31, 2023NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: October 31, 2023CONTINUANCE APP. GRANTED
Date: October 31, 2023MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: 2023-10-12T00:00:00ARB-CONT./DEFER APP. FILED
Date: October 31, 2023NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2023-10-16T00:00:00ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2023-10-16T00:00:00DISCOVERY MOTION FILED
Date: 2023-09-25T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2023-09-14T00:00:00ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2023-09-14T00:00:00CITY CHARGE SUBSEQUENT FILINGS
Date: 2023-09-25T00:00:00CERT MOTION IS CONTESTED
Date: 2023-09-25T00:00:00CERT MOTION IS CONTESTED
Date: 2023-08-28T00:00:00DISCOVERY MOTION FILED
Date: 2023-08-28T00:00:00MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: 2023-09-14T00:00:00CITY CHARGE SUBSEQUENT FILINGS
Date: 2023-08-28T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2023-08-22T00:00:00CONTINUANCE APP. GRANTED
Date: 2023-08-18T00:00:00MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: 2023-04-20T00:00:00ARB-CONT./DEFER APP. FILED
Date: 2023-08-18T00:00:00ARBITRATION HEARING SCHEDULED
Date: 2023-08-18T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2023-08-18T00:00:00CITY CHARGE SUBSEQUENT FILINGS
Date: 2023-08-18T00:00:00WITHDRAWAL/ENTRY OF APPEARANCE
Date: 2023-05-02T00:00:00MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: 2023-05-24T00:00:00ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2023-06-27T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2023-06-27T00:00:00MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: 2023-06-26T00:00:00MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: 2023-01-20T00:00:00CERTIFICATION FILED
Date: 2022-12-30T00:00:00WITHDRAWAL/ENTRY OF APPEARANCE
Date: 2022-12-16T00:00:00ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2023-04-28T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2022-12-02T00:00:00MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: 2023-03-03T00:00:00CERTIFICATION FILED
Date: 2023-03-10T00:00:00REPLY TO NEW MATTER & CROSSCLA
Date: 2022-12-07T00:00:00CERT MOTION IS CONTESTED
Date: 2023-01-11T00:00:00CERT MOTION IS SUBM BY AGRMT
Date: 2023-03-09T00:00:00DISCOVERY MOTION FILED
Date: 2023-04-05T00:00:00ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2022-11-18T00:00:00CERTIFICATION FILED
Date: 2023-02-09T00:00:00CERT MOTION IS CONTESTED
Date: 2023-04-12T00:00:00PRAECIPE-ATTACH VERIFICATION
Date: 2022-12-02T00:00:00ENTRY OF APPEARANCE
Date: 2022-11-23T00:00:00CERT MOTION IS CONTESTED
Date: 2023-02-23T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2023-01-24T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2023-04-28T00:00:00ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2023-01-24T00:00:00DISCOVERY MOTION FILED
Date: 2023-02-16T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00DISCOVERY MOTION FILED
Date: 2023-01-04T00:00:00ACTIVE CASE
Date: 2022-10-20T00:00:00ARBITRATION HEARING SCHEDULED
Date: 2022-10-20T00:00:00CITY CHARGE SUBSEQUENT FILINGS
Date: 2022-11-16T00:00:00PRAECIPE TO REINSTATE CMPLT
Date: 2022-11-04T00:00:00ENTRY OF APPEARANCE
Date: 2022-11-16T00:00:00COMMENCEMENT OF CIVIL ACTION
Date: 2022-10-20T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2022-10-20T00:00:00JURY TRIAL PERFECTED
Date: 2022-11-16T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.