Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Chavis, Tammie, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Brecher, Steven T, against City Of Philadelphia, Doe, Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority, represented by Mercogliano, Kathryn L, Skalski, Katelyn, in the jurisdiction of Philadelphia County, PA, . Philadelphia County, PA Superior Courts with MOORE, MARK presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 20, 2022 |
CategoryPremises Liability, Slip/Fall |
Last RefreshedJanuary 19, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPhiladelphia County, PA |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
FILE COPY PRINTED
Date: December 21, 2023NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: December 21, 2023SETTLED PRIOR TO ARBITRATION
Date: December 21, 2023ARBITRATION HEARING SCHEDULED
Date: October 09, 2023NOTICE GIVEN
Date: October 11, 2023NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: October 09, 2023CONTINUANCE APP. GRANTED
Date: October 09, 2023ARB-CONT./DEFER APP. FILED
Date: October 09, 2023NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2023-08-09T00:00:00ARBITRATION HEARING SCHEDULED
Date: 2023-08-07T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2023-08-07T00:00:00CONTINUANCE APP. GRANTED
Date: 2023-08-07T00:00:00ARB-CONT./DEFER APP. FILED
Date: 2023-08-07T00:00:00WITHDRAWAL/ENTRY OF APPEARANCE
Date: 2023-06-26T00:00:00WITHDRAWAL/ENTRY OF APPEARANCE
Date: 2023-03-31T00:00:00CERTIFICATION FILED
Date: 2023-05-12T00:00:00JURY TRIAL PERFECTED
Date: 2022-10-27T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2022-10-31T00:00:00ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2022-12-21T00:00:00ENTRY OF APPEARANCE
Date: 2022-12-19T00:00:00CITY CHARGE SUBSEQUENT FILINGS
Date: 2022-10-27T00:00:00REPLY TO NEW MATTER
Date: 2023-01-10T00:00:00REPLY TO NEW MATTER
Date: 2023-01-10T00:00:00JURY TRIAL PERFECTED
Date: 2022-12-21T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2022-10-31T00:00:00CITY CHARGE SUBSEQUENT FILINGS
Date: 2022-12-21T00:00:00ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2022-12-19T00:00:00ARBITRATION HEARING SCHEDULED
Date: 2022-10-20T00:00:00ENTRY OF APPEARANCE
Date: 2022-10-27T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2022-10-20T00:00:00ACTIVE CASE
Date: 2022-10-20T00:00:00COMMENCEMENT OF CIVIL ACTION
Date: 2022-10-20T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.